IA SF369 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 507.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(See SF 520.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of remotely piloted aircraft flying over certain property, and providing penalties.(See SF 520.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 520. S.J. 507. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2023 8:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Sweeney, Celsi, and Green. S.J. 395. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources and Environment. S.J. 389. |
Same As/Similar To
HF388 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
HF572 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
SF520 (Similar To) 2024-01-12 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Knox, and Zumbach. S.J. 103.
HF572 (Similar To) 2024-05-03 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 935.
SF520 (Similar To) 2024-01-12 - Subcommittee: Sweeney, Knox, and Zumbach. S.J. 103.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF369 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF369.html |