IA SF369 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the availability of and eligibility for investment tax credits, eliminating the venture capital investment tax credit, and including retroactive applicability and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1251.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the availability of and eligibility for investment tax credits, eliminating the venture capital investment tax credit, and including retroactive applicability and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1251.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-03-24 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2009-03-17 | Subcommittee, Wilhelm, Houser, and Stewart. S.J. 657. | |
2009-03-11 | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 608. | |
2009-03-09 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 567. | |
2009-03-09 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 564. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0403B&ga=83 |