IA SF337 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prosecuting attorneys training coordinator and council.(Formerly SSB 1023.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prosecuting attorneys training coordinator and council.(Formerly SSB 1023.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 338. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 327. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1023 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 337.