IA SSB1023 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF337
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 337.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prosecuting attorneys training coordinator and council.(See SF 337.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prosecuting attorneys training coordinator and council.(See SF 337.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 337. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2021 10:30AM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Boulton, and Goodwin. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. |
2021-01-12 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF337 (Replaced by) 2021-04-01 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 726.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1023 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1023.html |