IA SF331 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 737.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 737.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to energy efficiency reporting requirements applicable to certain gas and electric utilities. (Formerly SSB 1044.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to energy efficiency reporting requirements applicable to certain gas and electric utilities. (Formerly SSB 1044.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 737. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 721. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 721. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 584. |
2017-03-13 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 624. |
2017-03-22 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 755. |
2017-03-13 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 626. |
2017-03-13 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 0. H.J. 613. |
2017-03-13 | House | Substituted for HF 442. H.J. 612. |
2017-03-10 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 608. |
2017-03-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 602. |
2017-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 589. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 544. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 581. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays 0. S.J. 543. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 405. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 394. |
Same As/Similar To
SF109 (Similar To) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee reassigned: Zumbach, Lykam, and Zaun. S.J. 119.
HSB24 (Related) 2017-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 417.
SSB1044 (Related) 2017-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF442 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
HSB24 (Related) 2017-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 417.
SSB1044 (Related) 2017-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF442 (Similar To) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.