IA HSB24 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 417.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 417.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act authorizing certain gas and electric utilities to submit certain federally required forms or reports to the Iowa utilities board in lieu of existing reporting requirements.
Title
A bill for an act authorizing certain gas and electric utilities to submit certain federally required forms or reports to the Iowa utilities board in lieu of existing reporting requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 417. |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee: Landon, Mohr and Ourth. H.J. 109. |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2017 8:00AM House Lounge |
2017-01-23 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF109 (Replaced by) 2018-01-17 - Subcommittee reassigned: Zumbach, Lykam, and Zaun. S.J. 119.
SSB1044 (Related) 2017-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF331 (Replaced by) 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 737.
HF442 (Replaced by) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
SSB1044 (Related) 2017-02-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF331 (Replaced by) 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 737.
HF442 (Replaced by) 2017-03-13 - Withdrawn. H.J. 623.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB24 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB24.html |