IA SF329 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to industrial hemp, including the regulation of its production as part of a research program, marketing for purposes of manufacturing industrial hemp products, providing for fees, making appropriations, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction of certain property, and including penalties. (See SF 2398.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to industrial hemp, including the regulation of its production as part of a research program, marketing for purposes of manufacturing industrial hemp products, providing for fees, making appropriations, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction of certain property, and including penalties. (See SF 2398.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-23SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2017-03-07SenateSubcommittee: Behn, Bolkcom, and Schultz. S.J. 508.
2017-03-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 467.
2017-03-02SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 458.
2017-02-27SenateSubcommittee: Kapucian, Kinney, and Shipley. S.J. 413.
2017-02-23SenateIntroduced, referred to Agriculture. S.J. 394.

Same As/Similar To

HF415 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 457.
SF2398 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback