IA SF2398 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to industrial hemp, including the regulation of its production as part of a research program, marketing for purposes of manufacturing industrial hemp products, providing for fees, making appropriations, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction of certain property, and including penalties. (Formerly SF 329.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to industrial hemp, including the regulation of its production as part of a research program, marketing for purposes of manufacturing industrial hemp products, providing for fees, making appropriations, providing for enforcement and the confiscation and destruction of certain property, and including penalties. (Formerly SF 329.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/11/2018 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2018-04-10 | House | Subcommittee: Hein, Bloomingdale and Gaskill. H.J. 769. |
2018-04-05 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 751. |
2018-04-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 736. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 874. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 873. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5220 filed, adopted. S.J. 873. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Amendment S-5215 filed, adopted. S.J. 873. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 867. |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 773. |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 772. |
Same As/Similar To
SF329 (Similar To) 2017-03-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF415 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 457.
HF415 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Introduced, referred to Agriculture. H.J. 457.