IA SF328 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 466. S.J. 471.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 466. S.J. 471.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to licensed health care providers for purposes of state law regarding concussion and brain injury policies for extracurricular interscholastic activities.(See SF 466.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to licensed health care providers for purposes of state law regarding concussion and brain injury policies for extracurricular interscholastic activities.(See SF 466.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 466. S.J. 471. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Goodwin, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 359. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Education. S.J. 326. |
Same As/Similar To
SF466 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1025.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF328 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF328.html |