IA SF326 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 441.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing of biological products and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1029.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing of biological products and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1029.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 441. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | HF 305 substituted. S.J. 440. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 305. S.J. 390. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 380. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 379. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB38 (Related) 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 264.
SSB1029 (Related) 2017-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF305 (Similar To) 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 626.
SSB1029 (Related) 2017-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF305 (Similar To) 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 626.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF326 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF326.html |