IA HSB38 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF305
Note: Legislation replaced by SF326
Note: Legislation replaced by SF326
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing of biological products and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the prescribing of biological products and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 264. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Best, Dolecheck and Forbes. H.J. 117. |
2017-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/25/2017 3:00PM House Lounge |
2017-01-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1029 (Related) 2017-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF305 (Replaced by) 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 626.
SF326 (Replaced by) 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 441.
HF305 (Replaced by) 2017-03-10 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 626.
SF326 (Replaced by) 2017-03-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 441.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB38 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB38.html |