IA SF315 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to raw milk, by providing for the production of raw milk at certain dairies, the manufacture of products using raw milk, and the labeling and distribution of raw milk and manufactured products, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1107.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to raw milk, by providing for the production of raw milk at certain dairies, the manufacture of products using raw milk, and the labeling and distribution of raw milk and manufactured products, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1107.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2023-05-08 | House | Fiscal note. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1085. |
2023-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 865. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 800. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 37, nays 13. S.J. 799. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3125. S.J. 799. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3125. S.J. 776. |
2023-04-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 824. |
2023-05-05 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1037. |
2023-04-12 | House | Passed House, yeas 64, nays 35. H.J. 814. |
2023-04-12 | House | Amendment H-1205 adopted. H.J. 813. |
2023-04-11 | House | Amendment H-1205 filed. H.J. 806. |
2023-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 776. |
2023-04-03 | House | Placed on calendar. H.J. 756. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 756. |
2023-03-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1. |
2023-03-28 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/29/2023 12:30PM House Lounge 2. |
2023-03-28 | House | Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Johnson and Srinivas. H.J. 740. |
2023-03-27 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 734. |
2023-03-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 728. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 664. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 36, nays 14. S.J. 663. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 352. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 350. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1107 (Related) 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 315.