IA SSB1107 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF315

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to raw milk, by providing for the production of raw milk at certain dairies, the manufacture of products using raw milk, and the labeling and distribution of raw milk and manufactured products, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 315.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to raw milk, by providing for the production of raw milk at certain dairies, the manufacture of products using raw milk, and the labeling and distribution of raw milk and manufactured products, and making penalties applicable.(See SF 315.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-16SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 315.
2023-02-01SenateSubcommittee recommends passage. [].
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/01/2023 1:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
2023-01-31SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Westrich.
2023-01-31SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government.
2023-01-31SenateBy COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

SF315 (Replaced by) 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1086.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback