IA SF308 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 577. S.J. 593.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to a certificate of nonviable birth.(Formerly SSB 1062; See SF 577.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to a certificate of nonviable birth.(Formerly SSB 1062; See SF 577.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Human Resources Report (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 577. S.J. 593.
2021-03-10SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-03-03SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/10/2021 8:30AM 217 Conference Room.
2021-02-24SenateSubcommittee: Sinclair, Green, and Jochum. S.J. 455.
2021-02-22SenateReferred to Ways and Means. S.J. 412.
2021-02-10SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 314.
2021-02-10SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 308.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1062 (Related) 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 308.
SF577 (Similar To) 2021-04-15 - Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 964.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback