IA SSB1062 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Note: Legislation replaced by SF308

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 308.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to a certificate of nonviable birth.(See SF 308.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to a certificate of nonviable birth.(See SF 308.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 308.
2021-02-02SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2021-02-01SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2021 1:30PM 217 Conference Room.
2021-01-21SenateSubcommittee: Edler, Bolkcom, and Costello.
2021-01-20SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources.
2021-01-20SenateBy COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES

Same As/Similar To

SF308 (Replaced by) 2021-02-24 - Subcommittee: Sinclair, Green, and Jochum. S.J. 455.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback