IA SF3 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote traffic law enforcement systems, requiring removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions. (see SF 220.)
Title
A bill for an act prohibiting the use of automated or remote traffic law enforcement systems, requiring removal of existing systems, and including effective date provisions. (see SF 220.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zaun, Edler, and Taylor. S.J. 75. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 44. |
Same As/Similar To
SF220 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Deferred. S.J. 955.