IA SF220 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Deferred. S.J. 955.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Deferred. S.J. 955.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act regulating the use of automated traffic law enforcement systems, and providing a penalty. (Formerly SF 3.)
Title
A bill for an act regulating the use of automated traffic law enforcement systems, and providing a penalty. (Formerly SF 3.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 77 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 955. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-5240, ruled in order. S.J. 955. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-5240 to S-5157 filed. S.J. 919. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5157. S.J. 680. |
2018-03-14 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 587. |
2018-03-14 | House | Passed House, ayes 77, nays 21. H.J. 587. |
2018-03-14 | House | Amendments H-1274 and H-1441 out of order. H.J. 586. |
2018-03-14 | House | Amendment H-8257 adopted. H.J. 586. |
2018-03-14 | House | Amendment H-1267 lost, as amended. H.J. 586. |
2018-03-14 | House | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 585. |
2018-03-14 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of H-1267, as amended. H.J. 584. |
2018-03-14 | House | Point of order raised on H-1267, as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 584. |
2018-03-14 | House | Amendment H-8258 to H-1267 withdrawn. H.J. 584. |
2018-03-14 | House | Amendment H-8198 to H-1267 adopted. H.J. 584. |
2018-03-13 | House | Amendments H-8257 and H-8258 filed. H.J. 578. |
2018-03-07 | House | Amendment H-8198 filed. H.J. 517. |
2018-02-16 | House | Fiscal note. |
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 280. |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. H.J. 206. |
2018-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Hinson and R. Smith. H.J. 97. |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred to Transportation. H.J. 21. |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment H-1441 filed. H.J. 1117. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment H-1274 filed. H.J. 880. |
2017-04-03 | House | Amendment H-1267 filed. H.J. 849. |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 848. |
2017-03-23 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, Hinson and R. Smith. H.J. 766. |
2017-03-23 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 760. |
2017-03-22 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 754. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 730. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 787. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 31, nays 18. S.J. 729. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3224 out of order. S.J. 729. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3225 adopted. S.J. 728. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendment S-3227 lost. S.J. 728. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Amendments S-3224, S-3225, and S-3227 filed. S.J. 727. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 246. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 241. |
Same As/Similar To
SF3 (Similar To) 2017-01-25 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.