IA SF296 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported out of committee as SF 588. S.J. 548.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act creating a capital murder offense by establishing the penalty of death for murder in the first degree offenses involving kidnapping and sexual abuse offenses against the same victim who is a minor, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 588.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act creating a capital murder offense by establishing the penalty of death for murder in the first degree offenses involving kidnapping and sexual abuse offenses against the same victim who is a minor, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 588.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateReported out of committee as SF 588. S.J. 548.
2019-02-27SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2019-02-27SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Schultz, Bisignano, Chapman, Garrett, and Hogg. S.J. 418.
2019-02-21SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Chapman, and Hogg. S.J. 380.
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 337.

Same As/Similar To

SF588 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 859.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback