IA SF281 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the adoption by executive branch agencies of standards by reference to certain publications and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the adoption by executive branch agencies of standards by reference to certain publications and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2021 8:00AM RM 24A. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Giddens, and Reichman. S.J. 358. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 272. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF281 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF281.html |