IA SF274 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Fiscal note, final action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to speech and expression at public institutions of higher education, providing for remedies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1099.) Effective 3-27-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to speech and expression at public institutions of higher education, providing for remedies, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1099.) Effective 3-27-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateFiscal note, final action
2019-03-27SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 777.
2019-03-26SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 754.
2019-03-18SenateMessage from House. S.J. 640.
2019-03-14HouseImmediate message. H.J. 561.
2019-03-14HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 563.
2019-03-14HousePassed House, yeas 52, nays 44. H.J. 560.
2019-03-14HousePoint of order raised, Rule 10, decorum in debate, ruled point well taken. H.J. 559.
2019-03-14HouseSubstituted for HF 661. H.J. 559.
2019-03-13HousePassed on file. H.J. 549.
2019-03-12HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 500.
2019-03-11HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 493.
2019-03-11SenateImmediate message. S.J. 535.
2019-03-13SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 620.
2019-03-11SenatePassed Senate, yeas 35, nays 11. S.J. 532.
2019-03-11SenateAmendment S-3015 adopted. S.J. 532.
2019-03-11SenateAmendment S-3019 to S-3015 filed, lost. S.J. 531.
2019-03-11SenateAmendment S-3015 filed. S.J. 531.
2019-02-18SenateFiscal note.
2019-02-14SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 312.
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 308.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1099 (Related) 2019-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF316 (Similar To) 2019-02-08 - Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 238.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback