IA SF255 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs contacting discharged veterans regarding veteran benefits.(Formerly SSB 1052.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to county commissions of veteran affairs contacting discharged veterans regarding veteran benefits.(Formerly SSB 1052.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 621. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 144. |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/13/2022 9:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Ragan, and Reichman. S.J. 79. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 266. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 259. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1052 (Related) 2021-02-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 255.