IA SF2438 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 917.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 917.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3202.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations from the rebuild Iowa infrastructure fund and technology reinvestment fund, providing for related matters, and including effective date provisions.(Formerly SSB 3202.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 917. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | HF 2691 substituted. S.J. 916. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Amendment S-5179 adopted. S.J. 916. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Amendment S-5179 filed. S.J. 872. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Attached to HF 2691. S.J. 841. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 806. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 806. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3202 (Related) 2024-04-09 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2438.
HF2691 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.
HF2691 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 940.