IA SF242 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - NOBA: Senate Full Approps
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-04 - NOBA: Senate Full Approps
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to child in need of assistance and child abuse cases involving certain drugs and other substances.
Title
A bill for an act relating to child in need of assistance and child abuse cases involving certain drugs and other substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Chaz Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Shipley, Kinney, and Schneider. S.J. 275. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 271. |
Same As/Similar To
HF276 (Similar To) 2017-03-14 - Withdrawn. H.J. 644.
HF543 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
HF543 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1115.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF242 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF242.html |