IA SF2403 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 588.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 588.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to responsibility for payment of fees relating to termination of parental rights proceedings.(Formerly SF 2350, SSB 3005.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to responsibility for payment of fees relating to termination of parental rights proceedings.(Formerly SF 2350, SSB 3005.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 588. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | HF 2403 substituted. S.J. 587. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Attached to HF 2403. S.J. 511. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 467. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 465. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB527 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2403.
SSB3005 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2350.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
SF2350 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 467.
SSB3005 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2350.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
SF2350 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 467.