IA SF2350 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 467.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 467.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to responsibility for payment of fees relating to termination of parental rights proceedings.(Formerly SSB 3005; See SF 2403.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to responsibility for payment of fees relating to termination of parental rights proceedings.(Formerly SSB 3005; See SF 2403.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2403. S.J. 467. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 10:00AM Senate Lounge. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rowley, Petersen, and Sweeney. S.J. 355. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 298. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 293. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 287. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB527 (Related) 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2403.
SSB3005 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2350.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
SF2403 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 588.
SSB3005 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2350.
HF2403 (Similar To) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
SF2403 (Similar To) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 588.