IA SF2391 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2018 12:30PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2018 12:30PM House Lounge.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the charging of fees relating to copies of adoption decrees and certifications of adoption delivered by the clerk of court to specified entities. (Formerly SF 2050 and SF 2283.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the charging of fees relating to copies of adoption decrees and certifications of adoption delivered by the clerk of court to specified entities. (Formerly SF 2050 and SF 2283.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2018 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee: Holt, Bergan and Wolfe. H.J. 781. |
2018-04-10 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 762. |
2018-04-04 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 736. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 867. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 866. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 749. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 749. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2050 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2283 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2283 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.