IA SF2050 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the charging of fees relating to copies of adoption decrees and certifications of adoption delivered by the clerk of court to specified entities. (See SF 2283; SF 2391.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the charging of fees relating to copies of adoption decrees and certifications of adoption delivered by the clerk of court to specified entities. (See SF 2283; SF 2391.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Kinney, Shipley, and Sinclair. S.J. 128. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 107. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2283 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF2391 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2018 12:30PM House Lounge.
SF2391 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2018 12:30PM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2050 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2050.html |