IA SF2388 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Summary
A bill for an act establishing a hospital health care access assessment program, providing penalties, providing a future repeal, and including effective date and contingent implementation provisions. (Formerly SSB 3257.) Effective 4-14-10.
Title
A bill for an act establishing a hospital health care access assessment program, providing penalties, providing a future repeal, and including effective date and contingent implementation provisions. (Formerly SSB 3257.) Effective 4-14-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-26 | Message from House. S.J. 1030. | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate message. H.J. 1377. | |
2010-03-26 | Passed House, ayes 86, nays 7. H.J. 1376. | |
2010-03-26 | Asked and received unanimous consent for the immediate consideration. H.J. 1376. | |
2010-03-25 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1323. | |
2010-03-25 | Read first time, referred to Ways & Means. H.J. 1235. | |
2010-03-25 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1223. | |
2010-03-24 | Immediate message. S.J. 975. | |
2010-03-24 | Passed Senate, ayes 46, nays 4. S.J. 975. | |
2010-03-24 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 974. | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 969. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0962B&ga=83 |