IA SF2382 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 686.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 686.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to real estate brokers, and the rental or leasing of real estate, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 2052.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to real estate brokers, and the rental or leasing of real estate, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SF 2052.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 686. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | HF 2326 substituted. S.J. 685. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Attached to HF 2326. S.J. 342. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 319. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 306. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2052 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2382. S.J. 319.