IA SF2052 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2382. S.J. 319.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to real estate brokers, and the rental or leasing of real estate, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2382.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to real estate brokers, and the rental or leasing of real estate, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See SF 2382.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-15SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2382. S.J. 319.
2024-02-07SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
2024-02-01SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 1:00PM Senate Lounge.
2024-02-01SenateSubcommittee reassigned: Webster, Bisignano, and Bousselot. S.J. 199.
2024-01-22SenateSubcommittee: Webster, Bisignano, and Salmon. S.J. 132.
2024-01-17SenateIntroduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 112.

Same As/Similar To

SF2382 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Withdrawn. S.J. 686.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback