IA SF2382 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Amendments H-8474 and H-8479 filed. H.J. 951.

Summary

A bill for an act relating to criminal law and procedure including certain related administrative proceedings, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2196.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to criminal law and procedure including certain related administrative proceedings, providing penalties, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2196.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseAmendments H-8474 and H-8479 filed. H.J. 951.
2018-05-03HouseAmendment H-8468 filed. H.J. 950.
2018-05-02HouseAmendment H-8461 filed. H.J. 929.
2018-03-22HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671.
2018-03-16HouseCommittee amendment H-8273 filed. H.J. 599.
2018-03-16HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 599.
2018-03-12HouseSubcommittee recommends passage.
2018-03-06HouseSubcommittee: Baltimore, Hinson and Wolfe. H.J. 488.
2018-03-06HouseFiscal note, revised.
2018-03-02HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 446.
2018-03-01HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 433.
2018-02-28SenateImmediate message. S.J. 497.
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate, ayes 47, nays 2. S.J. 494.
2018-02-28SenateAmendment S-5051 as amended, adopted. S.J. 494.
2018-02-28SenateAmendment S-5065 lost. S.J. 494.
2018-02-28SenateAmendment S-5060 out of order. S.J. 494.
2018-02-28SenateAmendment S-5071 to S-5051 filed, adopted. S.J. 493.
2018-02-27SenateAmendments S-5060 to S-5051 and S-5065 to S-5051 filed. S.J. 477.
2018-02-27SenateDeferred. S.J. 466.
2018-02-27SenateAmendment S-5051 filed. S.J. 466.
2018-02-27SenateFiscal note.
2018-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 402.
2018-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 397.

Same As/Similar To

SF2196 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback