IA SF2196 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-12 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act modifying criminal code provisions relating to criminal records, penalties, prosecutions, appeals, driving privileges, and postconviction relief, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 2382.)
Title
A bill for an act modifying criminal code provisions relating to criminal records, penalties, prosecutions, appeals, driving privileges, and postconviction relief, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 2382.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Zaun. S.J. 278. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 252. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2382 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Amendments H-8474 and H-8479 filed. H.J. 951.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF2196 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF2196.html |