IA SF2378 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the board of educational examiners, including by modifying provisions related to the time in which complaints concerning licensed school employees having romantic or otherwise inappropriate relationships with students can be investigated, the mandatory reporting of licensed school employees who engage in grooming behavior toward students or the abuse of students, and reporting requirements related to the investigation of complaints against licensees and unlicensed school employees.(Formerly SSB 3050.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the board of educational examiners, including by modifying provisions related to the time in which complaints concerning licensed school employees having romantic or otherwise inappropriate relationships with students can be investigated, the mandatory reporting of licensed school employees who engage in grooming behavior toward students or the abuse of students, and reporting requirements related to the investigation of complaints against licensees and unlicensed school employees.(Formerly SSB 3050.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Education Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 537. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 313. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 305. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3050 (Related) 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2378.
HSB564 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2261.
HF2261 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 179.
HSB564 (Related) 2024-02-01 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2261.
HF2261 (Similar To) 2024-02-01 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 179.