IA SF2378 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1077.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1077.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, providing for fees and fines, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3243.) Item veto. Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations to the justice system, providing for fees and fines, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3243.) Item veto. Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1077. | |
2010-04-29 | Item veto. S.J. 1077. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Message from House. S.J. 1064. | |
2010-03-30 | Immediate message. H.J. 1552. | |
2010-03-30 | Motion to reconsider vote withdrawn. H.J. 1552. | |
2010-03-25 | Motion filed to reconsider vote on the bill by McCarthy. H.J. 1322. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 41. H.J. 1285. | |
2010-03-25 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8534. H.J. 1285. | |
2010-03-22 | Senate amendment H-8534 filed. H.J. 1154. | |
2010-03-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1150. | |
2010-03-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 924. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed Senate, ayes 30, nays 19. S.J. 924. | |
2010-03-22 | Senate concurred with S-5287, as amended. S.J. 923. | |
2010-03-22 | Amendment S-5301 filed, adopted. S.J. 923. | |
2010-03-19 | Message from House, with amendment S-5287. S.J. 910. | |
2010-03-18 | Immediate message. H.J. 1065. | |
2010-03-18 | Passed House, ayes 54, nays 44. H.J. 1064. | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment H-8460 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1064. | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment H-8493 adopted. H.J. 1064. | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment H-8493 filed. H.J. 1054. | |
2010-03-18 | Amendment H-8489 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1054. | |
2010-03-18 | Substituted for HF 2523. H.J. 1054. | |
2010-03-17 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 990. | |
2010-03-16 | Message from Senate. H.J. 986. | |
2010-03-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 855. | |
2010-03-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 31, nays 17. S.J. 848. | |
2010-03-16 | Deferred. S.J. 842. | |
2010-03-16 | Amendment S-5257 filed, lost. S.J. 842. | |
2010-03-16 | Amendment S-5259 filed, adopted. S.J. 842. | |
2010-03-16 | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 842. | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 841. | |
2010-03-16 | Point of order raised, ruled well taken. S.J. 841. | |
2010-03-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 835. | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 834. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0946B&ga=83 |