IA SF237 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers.
Title
A bill for an act relating to department of transportation employees designated as peace officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/09/2021 11:00AM RM 111. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Zumbach, Klimesh, and T. Taylor. S.J. 275. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 247. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF237 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF237.html |