IA SF2369 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to autologous and directed blood donations.(Formerly SF 2139.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to autologous and directed blood donations.(Formerly SF 2139.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services Report (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2024 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2024-02-22 | House | Subcommittee: Bradley, Baeth and Moore, T. H.J. 382. |
2024-02-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 343. |
2024-02-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 342. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 362. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 16. S.J. 362. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 314. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 304. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2139 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2369. S.J. 314.