IA SF2139 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2369. S.J. 314.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2369. S.J. 314.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to autologous and directed blood donations.(See SF 2369.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to autologous and directed blood donations.(See SF 2369.)
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Edler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2369. S.J. 314. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2024 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Costello, and Trone Garriott. S.J. 183. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 165. |
Same As/Similar To
SF2369 (Similar To) 2024-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. Vote Total: 3-0.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF2139 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF2139.html |