IA SF2356 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to health reform in Iowa by providing for options for health care coverage including a premium assistance program study and IowaCare program changes and creating an Iowa insurance information exchange. Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to health reform in Iowa by providing for options for health care coverage including a premium assistance program study and IowaCare program changes and creating an Iowa insurance information exchange. Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-27 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1380. | |
2010-03-26 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2010-03-26 | Immediate message. S.J. 1020. | |
2010-03-26 | Passed Senate, ayes 43, nays 6. S.J. 1017. | |
2010-03-26 | Senate concurred with S-5334. S.J. 1017. | |
2010-03-26 | Message from House, with amendment S-5334. S.J. 995. | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate message. H.J. 1300. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 1297. | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1297. | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-8623. H.J. 1296. | |
2010-03-25 | Ruled not germane H-8623. H.J. 1296. | |
2010-03-25 | Point of order raised H-8623 not germane. H.J. 1296. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8623 filed. H.J. 1295. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendments H-8416 and H-8509 withdrawn. H.J. 1295. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8562 adopted. H.J. 1295. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8441 out of order. H.J. 1294. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8559 as amended, adopted. H.J. 1294. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8629 filed, adopted. H.J. 1294. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8620 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 1294. | |
2010-03-23 | Amendments H-8559 and H-8562 filed. H.J. 1185. | |
2010-03-19 | Amendment H-8509 filed. H.J. 1123. | |
2010-03-17 | Amendment H-8441 filed. H.J. 1001. | |
2010-03-12 | Amendment H-8416 filed. H.J. 951. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 947. | |
2010-03-08 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 847. | |
2010-03-04 | Fiscal note. HCS. | |
2010-03-01 | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 749. | |
2010-03-01 | Message from Senate. H.J. 748. | |
2010-03-01 | Immediate message. S.J. 611. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 5. S.J. 609. | |
2010-03-01 | Amendment S-5152 adopted as amended. S.J. 609. | |
2010-03-01 | Amendment S-5158 adopted. S.J. 609. | |
2010-03-01 | Amendment S-5164B adopted. S.J. 609. | |
2010-03-01 | Amendment S-5164A ruled out of order. S.J. 608. | |
2010-03-01 | Amendment S-5168 adopted. S.J. 608. | |
2010-03-01 | Amendment S-5168 filed. S.J. 607. | |
2010-02-25 | Amendment S-5164 filed. S.J. 606. | |
2010-02-25 | Amendment S-5158 filed. S.J. 606. | |
2010-02-25 | Amendment S-5152 filed. S.J. 606. | |
2010-02-25 | Deferred. S.J. 588. | |
2010-02-24 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2010-02-16 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 448. | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 445. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0919B&ga=83 |