IA SF2346 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Subcommittee: Lundgren, James and Meyer, A.. H.J. 445.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to a pilot program to allow Medicaid members to participate in direct primary care agreements. (Formerly SF 2256.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to a pilot program to allow Medicaid members to participate in direct primary care agreements. (Formerly SF 2256.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-02HouseSubcommittee: Lundgren, James and Meyer, A.. H.J. 445.
2020-03-02HouseRead first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 411.
2020-03-02HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 409.
2020-02-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 461.
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate, yeas 31, nays 18. S.J. 458.
2020-02-27SenateAmendment S-5038 filed, adopted. S.J. 458.
2020-02-27SenateAmendment S-5037 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 458.
2020-02-27SenateAmendment S-5031 withdrawn. S.J. 458.
2020-02-26SenateAmendment S-5031 filed. S.J. 452.
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 374.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 368.

Same As/Similar To

SF2256 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2346. S.J. 374.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback