IA SF2345 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to judicial branch administration, child custody and visitation matters. (Formerly SSB 3094.) Effective 7-1-10.
Title
A bill for an act relating to judicial branch administration, child custody and visitation matters. (Formerly SSB 3094.) Effective 7-1-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1074. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-23 | Message from House. S.J. 957. | |
2010-03-23 | Immediate message. H.J. 1171. | |
2010-03-23 | Passed House, ayes 99, nays none. H.J. 1167. | |
2010-03-23 | House concurred in Senate amendment H-8411. H.J. 1166. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate amendment H-8411 filed. H.J. 949. | |
2010-03-11 | Message from Senate. H.J. 933. | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate message. S.J. 796. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 792. | |
2010-03-11 | Senate concurred with S-5163, as amended. S.J. 792. | |
2010-03-11 | Amendment S-5228 adopted. S.J. 792. | |
2010-03-10 | Amendment S-5228 filed. S.J. 785. | |
2010-02-25 | Message from House, with amendment S-5163. S.J. 601. | |
2010-02-25 | Immediate message. H.J. 738. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed House, ayes 95, nays none. H.J. 737. | |
2010-02-25 | Amendment H-8238 adopted. H.J. 737. | |
2010-02-25 | Amendment H-8237 adopted. H.J. 736. | |
2010-02-25 | Substituted for HF 2442. H.J. 735. | |
2010-02-24 | Amendments H-8237 and H-8238 filed. H.J. 715. | |
2010-02-23 | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 654. | |
2010-02-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 648. | |
2010-02-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 512. | |
2010-02-22 | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 509. | |
2010-02-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 408. | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 404. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0908B&ga=83 |