IA SF2341 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Subcommittee: Gustafson, Bergan and Wolfe. H.J. 600.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to older individuals and dependent adults and creating certain criminal offenses and civil actions, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1073.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to older individuals and dependent adults and creating certain criminal offenses and civil actions, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 1073.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseSubcommittee: Gustafson, Bergan and Wolfe. H.J. 600.
2020-03-12HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 592.
2020-03-11HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 574.
2020-03-11SenateImmediate message. S.J. 602.
2020-03-11SenatePassed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 601.
2020-03-11SenateAmendment S-5081 filed, adopted. S.J. 601.
2020-02-24SenateFiscal note.
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 375.
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 367.

Same As/Similar To

HSB70 (Related) 2019-01-28 - Subcommittee: Gustafson, Olson and Paustian. H.J. 173.
SSB1073 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2341.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback