IA SF2339 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-12 - Message from Senate. H.J. 714.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-12 - Message from Senate. H.J. 714.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for corporations, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3175.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for corporations, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3175.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 714. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 787. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 1. S.J. 786. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5139 adopted, as amended. S.J. 786. |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5144 to S-5139 adopted. S.J. 785. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amendments S-5139 and S-5144 filed. S.J. 781. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 375. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar, under Rule 28. S.J. 367. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3175 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2339.
HSB691 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
HF2537 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 10:00AM House Lounge.
HSB691 (Related) 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
HF2537 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 10:00AM House Lounge.