IA HSB691 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2339
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2537
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2537
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for business corporations, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing for business corporations, providing for certain fees, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 322. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2020 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee: Jacobsen, Bergan and Derry. H.J. 287. |
2020-02-17 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3175 (Related) 2020-02-18 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2339.
SF2339 (Replaced by) 2020-06-12 - Message from Senate. H.J. 714.
HF2537 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 10:00AM House Lounge.
SF2339 (Replaced by) 2020-06-12 - Message from Senate. H.J. 714.
HF2537 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Subcommittee Meeting: 03/11/2020 10:00AM House Lounge.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB691 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB691.html |