IA SF2339 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 769.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 769.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the redevelopment tax credits program by the economic development authority and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3050 and SF 2256.) Effective 7-1-14.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the administration of the redevelopment tax credits program by the economic development authority and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 3050 and SF 2256.) Effective 7-1-14.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 769. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 734. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 734. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 696. |
2014-04-01 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 628. |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays 2. H.J. 626. |
2014-04-01 | House | Substituted for HF 2455. H.J. 625. |
2014-03-27 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 605. |
2014-03-26 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 587. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 647. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 643. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5096 filed, adopted. S.J. 643. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 585. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 584. |