IA SF2336 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Amendment S-5099 filed. S.J. 526.
Status: Introduced on February 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-22 - Amendment S-5099 filed. S.J. 526.
Summary
A bill for an act relating to royalty fees for removal of sand and gravel from state-owned lands and waters located on the Cedar river in certain counties. (Formerly SSB 3169; see SF 2371.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to royalty fees for removal of sand and gravel from state-owned lands and waters located on the Cedar river in certain counties. (Formerly SSB 3169; see SF 2371.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-22 | Amendment S-5099 filed. S.J. 526. | |
2010-02-17 | Subcommittee, Dandekar, Hamerlinck, and Hogg. S.J. 469. | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Ways & Means. S.J. 443. | |
2010-02-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 382. | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 368. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0899B&ga=83 |