IA SF2333 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 888.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 888.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to amusement concessions concerning allowable prizes and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3023.) Effective 4-4-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to amusement concessions concerning allowable prizes and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 3023.) Effective 4-4-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 888. |
2018-04-02 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 844. |
2018-03-20 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 624. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 720. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 44, nays 5. S.J. 718. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5113. S.J. 717. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5113. S.J. 549. |
2018-03-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 487. |
2018-03-07 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 514. |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 66 nays 30. H.J. 476. |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment H-8161 adopted. H.J. 475. |
2018-03-06 | House | Substituted for HF 2282. H.J. 475. |
2018-03-05 | House | Amendment H-8161 filed. H.J. 461. |
2018-02-27 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 424. |
2018-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 407. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 456. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 5. S.J. 454. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 358. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 345. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3023 (Related) 2018-02-06 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB560 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2282 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.
HSB560 (Related) 2018-01-31 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF2282 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 487.