IA SF2326 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the solar energy system tax credit, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the solar energy system tax credit, and including effective date and applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/30/2022 12:30PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and T. Taylor. S.J. 370. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 317. |
Same As/Similar To
HF2395 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Withdrawn. H.J. 750.
HF2556 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and T. Taylor. S.J. 691.
HF2556 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Subcommittee: Goodwin, Dawson, and T. Taylor. S.J. 691.