IA SF2324 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073.
Summary
A bill for an act modifying provisions relating to franchises for the provision of cable service or video service, and including effective date provisions. Effective 4-12-10.
Title
A bill for an act modifying provisions relating to franchises for the provision of cable service or video service, and including effective date provisions. Effective 4-12-10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1073. | |
2010-03-30 | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-30 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1070. | |
2010-03-25 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1268. | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate message. S.J. 988. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 985. | |
2010-03-25 | Senate concurred with S-5327. S.J. 985. | |
2010-03-25 | Message from House, with amendment S-5327. S.J. 982. | |
2010-03-25 | Immediate message. H.J. 1238. | |
2010-03-25 | Passed House, ayes 96, nays 1. H.J. 1237. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8544 withdrawn. H.J. 1236. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8446 as amended, adopted. H.J. 1236. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8513 adopted. H.J. 1236. | |
2010-03-25 | Amendment H-8437 withdrawn. H.J. 1235. | |
2010-03-23 | Amendment H-8544 filed. H.J. 1184. | |
2010-03-19 | Amendment H-8513 filed. H.J. 1124. | |
2010-03-17 | Amendment H-8446 filed. H.J. 1001. | |
2010-03-16 | Amendment H-8437 filed. H.J. 988. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 947. | |
2010-03-05 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 826. | |
2010-03-02 | Subcommittee, Quirk, Lukan, and Petersen. H.J. 804. | |
2010-03-01 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 747. | |
2010-03-01 | Message from Senate. H.J. 746. | |
2010-02-25 | Immediate message. S.J. 591. | |
2010-02-25 | Passed Senate, ayes 47, nays none. S.J. 590. | |
2010-02-25 | Amendment S-5149 filed, adopted. S.J. 590. | |
2010-02-15 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 371. | |
2010-02-15 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 366. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0887B&ga=83 |