IA SF2322 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Subcommittee, Forristall, Dawson, and Fry. H.J. 469.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-10 - Subcommittee, Forristall, Dawson, and Fry. H.J. 469.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to services provided through the department of human services for children who have been adjudicated and establishing a state training school for delinquent females and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2084.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to services provided through the department of human services for children who have been adjudicated and establishing a state training school for delinquent females and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 2084.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | Subcommittee, Forristall, Dawson, and Fry. H.J. 469. |
2014-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 458. |
2014-02-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 365. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 426. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 22. S.J. 425. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Amendment S-5024 adopted. S.J. 424. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Amendment S-5024 filed. S.J. 412. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 354. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 348. |