IA SF2321 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 946.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 946.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to persons going armed with portable devices or weapons that direct an electronic current, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3101.) Effective 7-1-18.
Title
A bill for an act relating to persons going armed with portable devices or weapons that direct an electronic current, and providing penalties. (Formerly SSB 3101.) Effective 7-1-18.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 946. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 945. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 824. |
2018-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 709. |
2018-03-29 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 706. |
2018-03-22 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 671. |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 597. |
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2018 1:00PM House Lounge. |
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee: Windschitl and Hein and Oldson. H.J. 577. |
2018-03-13 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 569. |
2018-03-12 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 567. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 627. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 625. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5134 adopted, as amended. S.J. 625. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5135 to S-5134 filed, adopted. S.J. 625. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Amendment S-5134 filed. S.J. 625. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 354. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 343. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3101 (Related) 2018-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.